MN HF864 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Author added Dotseth
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Game and fish; shotgun zone for taking deer eliminated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Game and fish; shotgun zone for taking deer eliminated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-07HouseAuthor added Dotseth
2023-01-26HouseAuthor added Schultz
2023-01-25HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF314 (Similar To) 2023-01-17 - Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback