MN HF774 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Author added Heintzeman.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Author added Heintzeman.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Deaf and Hard-of-Hearing Services Act provisions modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Deaf and Hard-of-Hearing Services Act provisions modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Nels Pierson [R] | Rep. Joe McDonald [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Dave Pinto [D] |
Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Joshua Heintzeman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Author added Heintzeman. |
2017-03-09 | House | Authors added Albright, Lillie, and Hornstein. |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2017-02-09 | House | Author added Pinto. |
2017-02-06 | House | Author added Theis. |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF738 (Similar To) 2017-02-15 - Author added Fischbach