MN HF753 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-22 - House: Referred by Chair to Cultural and Outdoor Resources Finance Division
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-22 - House: Referred by Chair to Cultural and Outdoor Resources Finance Division
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Zoo improvements funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Minnesota Zoo improvements funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Atkins [D] | Rep. David Bly [D] | Rep. Karen Clark [D] | Rep. Pat Garofalo [R] |
Rep. Rick Hansen [D] | Rep. Alice Hausman [D] | Rep. Tara Mack [R] | Rep. Sandra Masin [D] |
Rep. Will Morgan [D] | Sen. Roger Reinert [D] | Rep. Phillip Sterner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-22 | House: Referred by Chair to Cultural and Outdoor Resources Finance Division | |
2009-12-22 | House: Recalled by Chair Finance | |
2009-03-18 | House: Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Finance Division | |
2009-03-18 | House: Division action, to pass and return to Finance | |
2009-02-23 | House: Author added Hausman | |
2009-02-12 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Finance | |
2009-02-12 | House: Referred by Chair to Cultural and Outdoor Resources Finance Division |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=House&f=HF0753&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | http://wdoc.house.leg.state.mn.us/leg/LS86/HF0753.0.pdf |