MN HF745 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Marriages by minors provisions eliminated, and proof of age required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marriages by minors provisions eliminated, and proof of age required.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateReferred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2019-03-11SenateIntroduction and first reading
2019-03-11SenateReceived from House
2019-03-07HouseBill was passed
2019-03-07HouseThird reading
2019-03-07HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 7, 2019
2019-02-27HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, February 28, 2019
2019-02-14HouseAuthor added Heintzeman
2019-02-14HouseSecond reading
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2019-02-04HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division

Same As/Similar To

SF1393 (Similar To) 2019-02-27 - Author added Relph

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback