MN SF1393 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - HF substituted in committee HF745
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - HF substituted in committee HF745
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Marriage by minors authorization provisions elimination
Title
Marriage by minors authorization provisions elimination
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Pappas [D] | Sen. Foung Hawj [D] | Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] | Sen. Michelle Benson [R] |
Sen. Jerry Relph [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | HF substituted in committee HF745 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Author added Relph |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Author added Benson |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF745 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 76 05/12/2020