MN HF737 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - Author added Clardy
Pending: House Higher Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Loan forgiveness and grants for home care worker education established, reports required, money transferred, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Loan forgiveness and grants for home care worker education established, reports required, money transferred, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-19HouseAuthor added Clardy
2023-03-13HouseAuthor added Brand
2023-02-06HouseAuthors added Norris and Klevorn
2023-02-02HouseAuthor added Hicks
2023-01-30HouseAuthors added Curran; Hassan
2023-01-23HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback