MN HF731 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-18 - Author added Schoen.
Pending: House Higher Education Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-18 - Author added Schoen.
Pending: House Higher Education Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tuition relief funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Tuition relief funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-18 | House | Author added Schoen. |
2015-03-16 | House | Author added Johnson, C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Authors added Halverson, Erhardt, Applebaum, Selcer, Masin, Ward, Lillie, Hortman, and Fischer. |
2015-02-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Policy and Finance |