MN HF722 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-13 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-13 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Conservation reserve program state incentives funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Conservation reserve program state incentives funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2023-02-06 | House | Author added Hollins |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1982 (Similar To) 2023-03-16 - Author added Hoffman