MN HF715 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-08 - Authors added Fischer and Pursell
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Gender-affirming health care; use of subpoenas to gather information prevented; child custody and child welfare provisions amended; and warrant, arrest, and extradition provisions amended.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gender-affirming health care; use of subpoenas to gather information prevented; child custody and child welfare provisions amended; and warrant, arrest, and extradition provisions amended.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-08HouseAuthors added Fischer and Pursell
2023-01-30HouseAuthor added Curran
2023-01-25HouseAuthors added Sencer-Mura, Becker-Finn, and Kotyza-Witthuhn
2023-01-23HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback