MN HF684 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Workforce housing use provided.
Title
Workforce housing use provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2015-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
2015-02-09 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Greater Minnesota Economic and Workforce Development Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF668 (Similar To) 2015-02-12 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Taxes