MN HF677 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Body art procedures and establishments regulation system established, penalty fees adopted, and money appropriated.
Title
Body art procedures and establishments regulation system established, penalty fees adopted, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Bunn [D] | Rep. Thomas Huntley [D] | Rep. Cy Thao [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means | |
2010-03-25 | House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to Finance | |
2010-03-18 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Finance | |
2010-03-18 | House: Referred by Chair to Health Care and Human Services Finance Division | |
2010-03-11 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Civil Justice | |
2010-03-04 | House: Author changed Bunn (chief) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to Health Care and Human Services Policy and Oversight | |
2009-02-12 | House: Referred by Chair to Licensing Division | |
2009-02-09 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Care and Human Services Policy and Oversight |