MN HF600 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Author added Myers
Pending: House Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Ramsey County; juvenile delinquency treatment homes and violence prevention and wellness efforts funding provided, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ramsey County; juvenile delinquency treatment homes and violence prevention and wellness efforts funding provided, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-09HouseAuthor added Myers
2023-01-26HouseAuthor added Curran
2023-01-23HouseAuthors added Becker-Finn; Lillie
2023-01-19HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF393 (Similar To) 2023-01-19 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback