MN HF515 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Author added Gruenhagen
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Federal conformity to section 179 expensing provided, and addition for section 179 expensing eliminated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal conformity to section 179 expensing provided, and addition for section 179 expensing eliminated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseAuthor added Gruenhagen
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Lillie
2019-02-07HouseAuthors added Gunther, Brand, Davids, Petersburg, and Erickson
2019-02-04HouseAuthors added Anderson, Daniels, Bennett, Poston, Nornes, Fabian, Lueck, Urdahl, and Schomacker
2019-01-31HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Taxes

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback