MN HF515 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Author added Gruenhagen
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Author added Gruenhagen
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal conformity to section 179 expensing provided, and addition for section 179 expensing eliminated.
Title
Federal conformity to section 179 expensing provided, and addition for section 179 expensing eliminated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Author added Gruenhagen |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Lillie |
2019-02-07 | House | Authors added Gunther, Brand, Davids, Petersburg, and Erickson |
2019-02-04 | House | Authors added Anderson, Daniels, Bennett, Poston, Nornes, Fabian, Lueck, Urdahl, and Schomacker |
2019-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |