MN HF4698 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Authors added Edelson and Rehm
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Authors added Edelson and Rehm
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rulemaking to require environmental impact statement for large animal projects required.
Title
Rulemaking to require environmental impact statement for large animal projects required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Authors added Edelson and Rehm |
2024-03-18 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
2024-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4234 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government and Veterans