MN HF4645 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Author added Hussein
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Author added Hussein
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota homeless study funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Minnesota homeless study funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Alicia Kozlowski [D] | Rep. Michael Howard [D] | Rep. Maria Perez-Vega [D] | Rep. Esther Agbaje [D] |
Rep. Mary Clardy [D] | Rep. Samakab Hussein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | Author added Hussein |
2024-03-11 | House | Author added Clardy |
2024-03-07 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4592 (Similar To) 2024-03-13 - Author added Champion