MN HF452 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-23 - Authors added Perryman; Murphy
Pending: House Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Lawful carry and possession of firearms at State Fair authorized.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lawful carry and possession of firearms at State Fair authorized.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-23HouseAuthors added Perryman; Murphy
2023-01-18HouseAuthor added Schultz
2023-01-17HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF141 (Similar To) 2023-01-11 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback