MN HF440 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Breast cancer screening procedures coverage required.
Title
Breast cancer screening procedures coverage required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-13 | House | Author added Robbins |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Tabke |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Edelson |
2019-02-25 | House | Authors added Stephenson and Elkins |
2019-02-04 | House | Author added Huot |
2019-01-31 | House | Authors added Mahoney, Demuth |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce |
Same As/Similar To
SF1038 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Second reading