MN SF1038 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Breast cancer screening procedures insurance plan coverage expansion requirement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Breast cancer screening procedures insurance plan coverage expansion requirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateSecond reading
2019-03-27SenateComm report: To pass
2019-03-26SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
2019-03-25SenateComm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
2019-02-11SenateReferred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy
2019-02-11SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF440 (Similar To) 2019-04-03 - Author added Bierman

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback