MN HF4304 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Author added Sencer-Mura
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Author added Sencer-Mura
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
White Earth State Forest land transfer to White Earth Band of Minnesota Chippewa Tribe required, tax-forfeited land disposition modified, and White Earth State Forest eliminated.
Title
White Earth State Forest land transfer to White Earth Band of Minnesota Chippewa Tribe required, tax-forfeited land disposition modified, and White Earth State Forest eliminated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Author added Sencer-Mura |
2024-03-14 | House | Author added Hanson, J., |
2024-02-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3480 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy