MN HF420 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Fee revenue reallocated, and Minnesota Family Resiliency Partnership funding increased.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fee revenue reallocated, and Minnesota Family Resiliency Partnership funding increased.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-13HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2023-01-25HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Workforce Development Finance and Policy
2023-01-17HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law

Same As/Similar To

SF1474 (Similar To) 2023-03-20 - Author added Pappas

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback