MN HF3671 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
County jail or detention center placement authorized for defendants with 90 days or less remaining of imprisonment terms.
Title
County jail or detention center placement authorized for defendants with 90 days or less remaining of imprisonment terms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Second reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Author added Poston |
2020-02-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Corrections Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3881 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy