MN HF3634 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - House: Author added Sterner
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - House: Author added Sterner
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
License revocation and license denial required for any health-related licensed professional convicted of a felony-level criminal sexual conduct offense.
Title
License revocation and license denial required for any health-related licensed professional convicted of a felony-level criminal sexual conduct offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | House: Author added Sterner | |
2010-04-06 | House: HF indefinitely postponed | |
2010-04-06 | House: Bills not identical, R/S, SF subbed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-03-29 | House: Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3147 | |
2010-03-25 | House: House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day | |
2010-03-18 | House: Second reading | |
2010-03-18 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended | |
2010-03-15 | House: Author added Kath | |
2010-03-15 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Public Safety Policy and Oversight | |
2010-03-11 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Care and Human Services Policy and Oversight |