MN HF3631 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Governor's action Approval
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Capital projects previous appropriations amended, and report submission date changed.
Title
Capital projects previous appropriations amended, and report submission date changed.
Sponsors
Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Matt Norris [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 57 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 98 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 98 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Governor's action Approval | |
2024-04-25 | Presented to Governor | |
2024-04-15 | House | Returned from Senate |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF4307 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF4307, now on General Orders |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Received from House |
2024-04-08 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2024-04-08 | House | Third reading as amended |
2024-04-08 | House | Amended |
2024-04-04 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 8, 2024 |
2024-04-02 | House | Second reading |
2024-04-02 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2024-03-21 | House | Author added Norris |
2024-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Capital Investment |
Same As/Similar To
SF4307 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3631, SF indefinitely postponed