MN SF4307 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3631, SF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3631, SF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Miscellaneous capital projects appropriations modifications
Title
Miscellaneous capital projects appropriations modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3631, SF indefinitely postponed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Capital Investment |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3631 (Similar To) 2024-04-26 - Secretary of State Chapter 88