MN HF362 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-08 - Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-08 - Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Comprehensive school mental health services lead positions established, and money appropriated.
Title
Comprehensive school mental health services lead positions established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-08 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Education Finance |
2023-01-26 | House | Author added Clardy |
2023-01-25 | House | Author added Pursell |
2023-01-23 | House | Authors added Frazier, Jordan, Greenman, and PĂ©rez-Vega |
2023-01-17 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF449 (Similar To) 2023-02-06 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Education Finance