MN HF3582 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Residential lease requirements amended.
Title
Residential lease requirements amended.
Sponsors
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D] | Rep. Dennis Smith [R] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] |
Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Sandra Masin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2018-05-14 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2018-05-10 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2949 |
2018-04-12 | House | Authors added Poston and Masin. |
2018-03-26 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2018-03-22 | House | Authors added Loeffler and Dehn, R. |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2949 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Second reading