MN SF2949 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Residential lease requirements modifications
Title
Residential lease requirements modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | House | Second reading |
2018-05-14 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2018-05-10 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3582 |
2018-05-10 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 65-0 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Author added Pappas |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3582 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - HF indefinitely postponed