MN HF3577 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-08 - Author added Sencer-Mura
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-08 - Author added Sencer-Mura
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Packaging Waste and Cost Reduction Act established, and rulemaking authorized.
Title
Packaging Waste and Cost Reduction Act established, and rulemaking authorized.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Author added Sencer-Mura |
2024-04-04 | House | Author added Gomez |
2024-03-25 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-03-18 | House | Author added Agbaje |
2024-03-14 | House | Author added Hanson, J. |
2024-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2024-03-11 | House | Author added Her |
2024-03-07 | House | Author added Wolgamott |
2024-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government Finance and Policy |
2024-02-28 | House | Authors added Elkins and Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2024-02-22 | House | Authors added Hill, Xiong, Rehm, Tabke, Finke, Edelson, and Freiberg |
2024-02-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce Finance and Policy |
2024-02-13 | House | Authors added Pursell and Curran |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3561 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt rule 2.03 suspended