MN HF350 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Christensen
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Christensen
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Statewide cessation services to help Minnesotans quit using tobacco products authorized.
Title
Statewide cessation services to help Minnesotans quit using tobacco products authorized.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Author added Christensen |
2019-03-18 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Bierman |
2019-02-28 | House | Authors added Noor, Hansen, and Halverson |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Authors added Olson and Neu |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-07 | House | Authors added Elkins and Zerwas |
2019-02-04 | House | Authors added Long and Wagenius. |
2019-01-28 | House | Authors added Freiberg, Loeffler, and Dehn |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF461 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy