MN HF3486 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lead service line replacement authority provisions changed.
Title
Lead service line replacement authority provisions changed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Second reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-02-27 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Health and Human Services Policy |
2020-02-27 | House | Author added Jordan as a chief author |
2020-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF4601 (Similar To) 2020-05-12 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy