MN HF3431 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 1, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 1, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State and local government supplemental budget bill.
Title
State and local government supplemental budget bill.
Sponsors
Rep. Ginny Klevorn [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 1, 2024 |
2024-04-29 | House | Second reading |
2024-04-29 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2024-04-24 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2024-04-02 | House | Author changed Klevorn added as chief author |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3915 (Similar To) 2024-02-19 - Referred to State and Local Government and Veterans