MN HF3410 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Classification of commercial dog and cat breeder data collected and maintained by Board of Animal Health amended; kennel and dealer advertising requirements modified; and Board of Animal Health required to post kennel, dealer, and commercial breeder information.
Title
Classification of commercial dog and cat breeder data collected and maintained by Board of Animal Health amended; kennel and dealer advertising requirements modified; and Board of Animal Health required to post kennel, dealer, and commercial breeder information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Author added Hemmingsen-Jaeger |
2024-03-21 | House | Second reading |
2024-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2024-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2024-03-11 | House | Author added Curran |
2024-03-04 | House | Author added Myers |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3458 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Author added Marty