MN HF3409 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-11 - Author added Hertaus.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-11 - Author added Hertaus.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Wastewater treatment technology incentive provided.
Title
Wastewater treatment technology incentive provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Fabian [R] | Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] | Rep. Jason Metsa [D] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] |
Rep. Jerry Hertaus [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | House | Author added Hertaus. |
2016-05-09 | House | Author added Theis. |
2016-05-05 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2016-05-05 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2016-05-04 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF 3272 |
2016-04-06 | House | Second reading |
2016-04-06 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2016-03-30 | House | Authors added Poppe and Metsa. |
2016-03-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3272 (Similar To) 2016-05-17 - Secretary of State Chapter 104 05/12/16