MN HF3384 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-21 - Authors added Kotyza-Witthuhn and Bernardy
Pending: House Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-21 - Authors added Kotyza-Witthuhn and Bernardy
Pending: House Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senior citizens' property tax deferral requirements modified.
Title
Senior citizens' property tax deferral requirements modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Jessica Hanson [D] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] | Rep. Matt Bliss [R] | Rep. Carlie Kotyza-Witthuhn [D] |
Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | House | Authors added Kotyza-Witthuhn and Bernardy |
2022-02-15 | House | Author added Bliss |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Property Tax Division |
2022-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF3184 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Referred to Taxes