MN HF3377 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-08 - Author added Bierman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-08 - Author added Bierman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Homeless youth nonprofit grants authorized, and money appropriated.
Title
Homeless youth nonprofit grants authorized, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Heather Keeler [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Ruth Richardson [D] | Rep. Michael Howard [D] |
Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Author added Bierman |
2022-03-21 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2022-03-10 | House | Authors added Howard and Fischer |
2022-03-09 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Human Services Finance and Policy |
2022-03-03 | House | Author added Richardson |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred by Chair to Preventing Homelessness Division |
2022-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3155 (Similar To) 2022-04-06 - Author added Port