MN SF3155 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Author added Port
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Author added Port
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grant authorization and appropriation for nonprofits serving homeless youth in Minnesota
Title
Grant authorization and appropriation for nonprofits serving homeless youth in Minnesota
Sponsors
Sen. David Dibble [D] | Sen. Bobby Champion [D] | Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] | Sen. Sandra Pappas [D] |
Sen. Lindsey Port [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Author added Port |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Author added Pappas |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Author added Dziedzic |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Author added Champion |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3377 (Similar To) 2022-04-08 - Author added Bierman