MN HF3367 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Practice of advanced practice registered nurses modified.
Title
Practice of advanced practice registered nurses modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2018-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2018-03-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2917 (Similar To) 2018-03-14 - Second reading