MN HF329 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Author added Sencer-Mura
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Author added Sencer-Mura
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Boundary Water Canoe Area Wilderness mining restrictions modified.
Title
Boundary Water Canoe Area Wilderness mining restrictions modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | House | Author added Sencer-Mura |
2023-05-09 | House | Author added Norris |
2023-03-02 | House | Author added Edelson |
2023-02-27 | House | Author added Hicks |
2023-02-08 | House | Authors added Clardy and Pursell |
2023-02-06 | House | Author added Rehm |
2023-02-02 | House | Author added Smith |
2023-01-25 | House | Authors added PĂ©rez-Vega and Lee, K. |
2023-01-23 | House | Author added Brand |
2023-01-19 | House | Authors added Agbaje; Hornstein; Acomb |
2023-01-18 | House | Author added Pryor |
2023-01-17 | House | Authors added Kraft; Xiong; Keeler; Freiberg; Newton; Hanson, J.; Stephenson; Curran; Moller; Vang; Gomez; Hemmingsen-Jaeger; Bahner; and Liebling |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF167 (Similar To) 2023-01-23 - Author added Fateh