MN SF167 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-23 - Author added Fateh
Pending: Senate Environment, Climate, and Legacy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-23 - Author added Fateh
Pending: Senate Environment, Climate, and Legacy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Boundary Water Canoe Area Wilderness mining restrictions modification
Title
Boundary Water Canoe Area Wilderness mining restrictions modification
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] | Sen. Steve Cwodzinski [D] | Sen. Jen McEwen [D] | Sen. Alice Mann [D] |
Sen. Omar Fateh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-23 | Senate | Author added Fateh |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Author added Mann |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Author added McEwen |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF329 (Similar To) 2023-05-11 - Author added Sencer-Mura