MN HF328 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Authors added Gruenhagen and Nornes
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Dyslexia instruction in teacher preparation programs required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dyslexia instruction in teacher preparation programs required.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07HouseAuthors added Gruenhagen and Nornes
2019-01-31HouseAuthor added Theis
2019-01-28HouseAuthors added Erickson and Lien.
2019-01-24HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback