MN HF2952 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-08 - House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-08 - House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State employees retirement plan contribution rates increased, adjustment provisions changed, refund interest rates reduced, augmentation rates reduced, interest eliminated, vesting requirements and early retirement reduction rates increased, rates reduced, amortization periods extended, study required, and bylaw amendments authorized.
Title
State employees retirement plan contribution rates increased, adjustment provisions changed, refund interest rates reduced, augmentation rates reduced, interest eliminated, vesting requirements and early retirement reduction rates increased, rates reduced, amortization periods extended, study required, and bylaw amendments authorized.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | House: Division action, to pass as amended and return to Finance | |
2010-03-24 | House: Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division | |
2010-03-23 | House: Committee report, to pass as amended and re-refer to Finance | |
2010-02-15 | House: Introduction and first reading, referred to State and Local Government Operations Reform, Technology and Elections |