MN HF294 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Manufacturers required to report and maintain prescription drug prices, filing of health plan prescription drug formularies required, health care coverage provisions modified, prescription benefit tool requirements established, and prescription drug benefit transparency and disclosure required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Manufacturers required to report and maintain prescription drug prices, filing of health plan prescription drug formularies required, health care coverage provisions modified, prescription benefit tool requirements established, and prescription drug benefit transparency and disclosure required.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-15HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
2023-02-01HouseAuthor added Her
2023-02-01HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce Finance and Policy
2023-01-30HouseAuthor added Bahner
2023-01-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF328 (Similar To) 2023-03-20 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback