MN HF29 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Author added Xiong, J.
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-11 - Author added Xiong, J.
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Earned sick and safe time provided, rulemaking authorized, civil penalties imposed, and reports required.
Title
Earned sick and safe time provided, rulemaking authorized, civil penalties imposed, and reports required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2019-01-31 | House | Authors added Bernardy, Bierman, Elkins |
2019-01-28 | House | Authors added Nelson and Dehn |
2019-01-17 | House | Author added Koegel |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor |
Same As/Similar To
SF528 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Withdrawn and returned to author