MN HF2807 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Jordan
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Jordan
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Marijuana and nonsynthetic THC reclassified from a Schedule I to a Schedule II controlled substance, small amount of marijuana definition modified, weight of fluids in water pipes prohibited from being used to determine marijuana mixture weights, and record expungement authorized in certain instances.
Title
Marijuana and nonsynthetic THC reclassified from a Schedule I to a Schedule II controlled substance, small amount of marijuana definition modified, weight of fluids in water pipes prohibited from being used to determine marijuana mixture weights, and record expungement authorized in certain instances.
Sponsors
Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
Rep. Hunter Cantrell [D] | Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Jordan |
2019-04-11 | House | Author added Moran |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-04-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF2198 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Author added Jensen