MN SF2198 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Author added Jensen
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Author added Jensen
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Marijuana and nonsynthetic THC reclassification from a schedule I to a schedule II controlled substance
Title
Marijuana and nonsynthetic THC reclassification from a schedule I to a schedule II controlled substance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Author added Jensen |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Author added Dziedzic |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2807 (Similar To) 2020-02-17 - Author added Jordan