MN HF2650 | 2011-2012 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-30 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-30 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Renewable development account regulated.
Title
Renewable development account regulated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2012-03-30 | House | Bills not identical, R/S, SF substituted on General Register |
2012-03-29 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2181 |
2012-03-21 | House | Second reading |
2012-03-21 | House | Committee report, to pass as amended |
2012-03-05 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment, Energy and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |