MN HF2613 | 2013-2014 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-04 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-04 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Hennepin County; multijurisdictional reinvestment program modified.
Title
Hennepin County; multijurisdictional reinvestment program modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Nelson [D] | Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Lyndon Carlson [D] | Rep. Ryan Winkler [D] |
Rep. Phyllis Kahn [D] | Rep. Debra Hilstrom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2014-04-04 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF2162 |
2014-03-31 | House | Second reading |
2014-03-31 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2014-03-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |