MN HF257 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - Author added Olson, L.
Pending: House Climate and Energy Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - Author added Olson, L.
Pending: House Climate and Energy Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Utility requirements modified, and restrictions on the use of residential solar energy systems prohibited.
Title
Utility requirements modified, and restrictions on the use of residential solar energy systems prohibited.
Sponsors
Rep. Ami Wazlawik [D] | Rep. Nolan West [R] | Rep. John Heinrich [R] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Author added Olson, L. |
2021-03-25 | House | Author added Heinrich |
2021-03-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy |
2021-03-01 | House | Author added West |
2021-02-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2267 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Author added Carlson