MN SF2267 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Author added Carlson
Pending: Senate Civil Law and Data Practices Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Author added Carlson
Pending: Senate Civil Law and Data Practices Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Residential solar energy systems use restrictions prohibition
Title
Residential solar energy systems use restrictions prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Author added Carlson |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Author added Clausen |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Author added Newton |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF257 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Author added Olson, L.